THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:13:20 PM
Gubbay, Jonathan Benjamin
CPSO#:
83756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of New South Wales Faculty of, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4500 Oak St
BC Children's Hospital and BC Women
Division of Microbioogy, Department
Vancouver BC V6H 3N1
Phone: 604-875-2345 Ext. 6694
Fax: 604-875-3777
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Feb 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:22 Feb 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN BENJAMIN GUBBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUBBAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2005 to 09 Dec 2005
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Apr 2007
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2007 to 24 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2009 |