THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:44:08 AM
Hervieux, Brad Matyas
CPSO#:
83755
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163403131
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:04 Nov 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRAD MATYAS HERVIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERVIEUX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 20 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2008 |