THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:36:01 AM
Kotrec, Marian
CPSO#:
83741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Slovak
Education: Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
35 Albert St W
Thorold ON L2V 2G4
Phone: (905) 935-0312
Fax: (905) 935-2949
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIAN KOTREC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTREC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 28 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 29 Oct 2005 to 31 May 2006
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 17 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2012 to 21 Mar 2012
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2012 |