THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:40:39 AM
Graham, John Joseph
CPSO#:
83715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5918
Fax: (416) 864-5914
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:11 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 22 Nov 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |
|
Active |