THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:58:59 PM
Selzner-Malekkiani, Nazia
CPSO#:
83701
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Paris, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11Th Floor
PMB Room 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3451
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2005 to 18 Nov 2005
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |