THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:58:38 AM
Veselskiy, Oleg Ivanovich
CPSO#:
83695
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Ukrainian Medical and Dental Academy, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7L6
Phone: 705-876-5021
Fax: 705-876-5058
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLEG IVANOVICH VESELSKIY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VESELSKIY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 13 Feb 2012
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |