THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:18:11 PM
Selzner, Markus
CPSO#:
83694
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5884
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:02 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2005 to 12 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |