THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:08:29 PM
Puchyr, Martina
CPSO#:
83676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON M3M0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 21500
Fax: 416-242-1068
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTINA PUCHYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUCHYR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 17 Oct 2008
EL - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |