THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:48:36 PM
Sadoughi, Mehdi
CPSO#:
83674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 710
115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 745-1597
Fax: (416) 745-2192
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHDI SADOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADOUGHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 23 Nov 2005
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |