THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:29:13 PM
Gauthier, Nadine Mylene
CPSO#:
83671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Cardiology
501Smyth Road
CCW 1682
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8165
Fax: (613) 739-6727
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE MYLENE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2005 to 25 Sep 2005
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 04 Mar 2012
Research Fellows - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |