THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:06:27 PM
D'Hue, Joel Oliver
CPSO#:
83657
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Emory University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joel D'Hue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |