THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 10:59:54 AM
Bahal, Maglin Nitha
CPSO#:
83656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vivera, Maglin Nitha (used until: 05 Dec 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Park Medical
Units 2 & 3
1959 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 1M4
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGLIN NITHA BAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2005 to 07 Sep 2005
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
EL - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2006 |