THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:56:05 PM
Ribeiro, Luciana Torres
CPSO#:
83652
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
911 Queens Blvd
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Radiology
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-749-4300 Ext. 3879
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUCIANA TORRES RIBEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBEIRO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2010 |