THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:38:36 PM
Tassis, Andreas
CPSO#:
83635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREAS TASSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASSIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |