THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:38:03 AM
Higgs, Stewart Ian Llewellyn
CPSO#:
83626
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Thomas's Hospital Medical School, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6220 28 Hwy
Woodview ON K0L 3E0
Phone: 416-951-1044
Fax: 416-987-0013
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S.I.L. Higgs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Samir Antowan
Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
Unit B 5
360 Dundas Street East
Oakville Ontario
L6H 6Z9
Tel: (905) 257-8777
Fax: (905) 257-0437
Date Received: 19 Dec 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEWART IAN LLEWELLYN HIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2005 |