THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:18:08 PM
Serb, Abdusalam Milod
CPSO#:
83616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St John Regional Hospital
400 University Avenue
St John NB E2L 3L6
Phone: (506) 648-6713
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr Abdusalam Serb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUSALAM MILOD SERB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 15 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2012 |