THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:09:14 PM
Nofech-Mozes, Sharon
CPSO#:
83611
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E4 23C
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 04 Sep 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2013 |
|
Active |