THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:42:17 AM
Pinto, Victoria Josephine Maria
CPSO#:
83588
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
631 Queeston Road
Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 560-4600
Fax: (905) 560-2644
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTORIA JOSEPHINE MARIA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 13 Oct 2005
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2010 |