THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:01:54 PM
Dudar, Amber Dawn
CPSO#:
83582
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7755
Fax: (807) 346-6206
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMBER DAWN DUDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 07 Jan 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 03 May 2007 to 30 May 2007
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2008 |