THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:06:21 PM
Sochocka, Elzbieta Krystyna
CPSO#:
83570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish, Russian
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
330 Bronte St South
Unit 120
Milton ON L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-9961
Fax: (905) 693-0982
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |