THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:34:15 AM
Zolfaghari, Shahram
CPSO#:
83544
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ghazvin University of Medical Sciences, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St Laurent Blvd., Unit 29
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHRAM ZOLFAGHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOLFAGHARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2005 to 27 Sep 2005
AVP - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |