THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:15:00 AM
Boniolo, Hernan
CPSO#:
83542
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
368 College Street North
Durham ON N0G 1R0
Phone: (519) 369-2510
Fax: (519) 369-3831
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HERNAN BONIOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIOLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Oct 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |