THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:20:34 AM
Rajeswaran, Srirani
CPSO#:
83526
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Sri Lanka, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Srirani Rajeswaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For Medical Records contact;
www. GetMyMedrecord.ca 1-888-563-3732, Ext.1
RSRS, Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563 3732 Fax: 1-877-398-5932
Date Received: 22 Mar 2022
Instructions/Address:Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services (RSRS) at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Mar 2022 |