THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 3:59:22 AM
Sud, Shelly
CPSO#:
83514
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital de Gatineau - Cancerologie
909 Boul. La Verendrye
Gatineau QC J8P 7H2
Phone: 819-966-8038
Fax: 819-966-6264
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHELLY SUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2005 |