THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:13:51 AM
Wong, Yat Wing
CPSO#:
83505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9019 Bayview Avenue
Unit 5-6
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:24 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YAT WING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2008 |