THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:21:03 AM
Maslowski, Aleksander
CPSO#:
83501
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Bialystok University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maslowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2023 |