THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:34:56 AM
Jablonowski, Karin Alexandra
CPSO#:
83490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
402 - 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 647-368-6424
Fax: 416 840 7075
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Jul 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARIN ALEXANDRA JABLONOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABLONOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Nov 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 2, 2022, Dr. Karin Jablonowski has completed all components of the SCERP dated May 14, 2018.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)