THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:13:36 AM
Nowicki, Aleksandra Agnieszka
CPSO#:
83486
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC
800 Commissionders Rd. E.
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55350
Fax: (519) 685-8595
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA AGNIESZKA NOWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWICKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |