THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:29:13 PM
Koltin, Dror
CPSO#:
83461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Apr 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |