THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:20:19 PM
Amin, Reham Tarek
CPSO#:
83457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
St Joseph Health Centre
Department of Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REHAM TAREK AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2007 |