THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:20:12 PM
Arzola Villalobos, Gracian Cristian
CPSO#:
83456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Chile, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and
Pain Management
600 University Avenue Room 19-104
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |