THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:18:35 AM
Lee, Raymond Paul
CPSO#:
83441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Lake Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 830-5972
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Sep 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAYMOND PAUL LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2021 |