THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:39:26 AM
Tawil, Basel El
CPSO#:
83439
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
3rd Floor
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-4755
Fax: (519) 322-5965
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASEL EL TAWIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2008 |