THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:09:21 PM
Zhang, Ying
CPSO#:
83421
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
Phone: 905-889-7997
Fax: (905) 889-2666
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Mar 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YING ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2008 |