THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:04:32 AM
Steyn, Andrea Melissa Prima
CPSO#:
83420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Procter, Andrea Melissa Prima (used until: 08 Jul 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Penticton Regional Hospital
550 Carmi Avenue
Penticton BC V2A 3G6
Phone: (250) 492-4000
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Steyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Jul 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA MELISSA PRIMA STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2008 |