THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:34:22 AM
Kanwal, Tejpreet Kaur
CPSO#:
83418
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: J. J. M. Medical College, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
59-2720 North Park Drive
Brampton ON L6S0E9
Phone: (905) 230-3012
Fax: (905) 230-3017
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TEJPREET KAUR KANWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 27 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |