THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:31:16 PM
Torres Jimenez, Monica
CPSO#:
83417
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
435 The Boardwalk, Suite 200
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Phone: 519-578-7484
Fax: 519-579-2432
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA TORRES JIMENEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TORRES JIMENEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2011 |