THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:46:41 AM
Klein, Benjamin Julius
CPSO#:
83411
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-163 Paris Rd
Brantford ON N3R 1J2
Phone: 519-649-4196
Fax: (226) 493-0194
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JULIUS KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 28 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |