THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:52:59 PM
Barkman, Frederick
CPSO#:
83410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Frederick Barkman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FREDERICK BARKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2009 |