THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:56:31 AM
Khan, Asmat Ullah
CPSO#:
83408
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
204-78 George St
Ottawa ON K1N 5W1
Phone: 613-866-2524
Fax: 613-691-7715
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 3, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 3, 2021, Lanark County Mental Health notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on May 11, 2021, Dr. Asmat Ullah Khan resigned his privileges at Brockville General Hospital and Lanark County Mental Health.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Dec 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASMAT ULLAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 27 Nov 2007 to 26 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 27 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2014 to 27 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2015 |