THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:41:45 PM
Divakara Menon, Syamkumar Madathattu
CPSO#:
83399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: Calicut University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
HGH Box 340, M-513
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44760
Fax: (905) 577-1447
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Jan 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2018 |
|
Active |