THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:37:02 PM
van Adel, Brian Anthony
CPSO#:
83382
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Wing HGH
Room 711
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46373
Fax: (905) 577-8036
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brian van Adel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN ANTHONY VAN ADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ADEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2008 to 03 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2011 |