THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:55:56 PM
Howell, Kathleen Elizabeth
CPSO#:
83378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NSHA Community Mental Health
2nd Floor, Cole Harbour Place
51 Forest Hills Parkway, Box 4
Dartmouth NS B2W 6C6
Phone: 902-434-3263
Fax: 902-434-0181
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2008 to 25 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2010 |