THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:43:18 PM
Kolesnichenko, Angela Patricia
CPSO#:
83369
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Instituto De Ciencias De La Salud, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
P O Box ICP 2500
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA PATRICIA KOLESNICHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLESNICHENKO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Aug 2005
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |