THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:10:46 PM
Kaur, Harkiran
CPSO#:
83328
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Mothilal Nehru Medical College,Allahabad, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Department of Laboratory medicine
THP (Credit Valley Hospital)
Mississauga ON L5M2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Ext. 2765
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2011 |