THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:51:54 PM
Chakraborty, Santanu
CPSO#:
83326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Calcutta, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Oct 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |