THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:43:56 PM
Roy, Anita
CPSO#:
83321
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sinclair Medical Centre
Suite 106
99 Sinclair Avenue
Georgetown ON L7G 5G1
Phone: (905) 877-9998
Fax: (905) 877-8994
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANITA ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Trauma General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2014 |