THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:57:05 PM
Dave, Sumit
CPSO#:
83320
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Surgery
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8439
Fax: (519) 667-6581
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:01 Jul 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |