THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:28:13 PM
Hamed Abdelazim, Hala Mohammed Fathi
CPSO#:
83318
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health St Catharines Site
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 33375
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HALA MOHAMMED FATHI HAMED ABDELAZIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMED ABDELAZIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2012 |