THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:05:13 PM
Sabri, Kourosh
CPSO#:
83309
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
14 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
3V2 Paediatric Ophthalmology Clinic
Department of Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73509
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kourosh Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:24 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOUROSH SABRI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SABRI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. SABRI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. SABRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2017 |